Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pillemer & Pillemer, against Alcala, Adam Edward, represented by Stratman, Schwartz & Willams-Abrego, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Dest, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDest, Michael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle $10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice Imaged
Date: December 31, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 31, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 02, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 31, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 31, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: July 01, 2019Certificate of Electronic Recording Imaged
Date: September 27, 2019Certificate of Electronic Recording Imaged
Date: January 28, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 18, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: February 19, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.