Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Castro, Pearl De, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Watson, Mark C., against Lipumano-Picazo, Lerida F., Parayno, Sonja, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan I. Etezadi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan I. Etezadi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2015 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial318 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time68 days |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: January 10, 2019Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: April 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 09, 2016Memorandum of Costs
Date: August 22, 2017Complaint
Date: October 16, 2015Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Date: October 01, 2018Order
Date: August 12, 2016Motion
Date: March 11, 2016Motion
Date: December 05, 2016Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: January 10, 2019Claim of Exemption
Date: October 10, 2018Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Date: September 18, 2018Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: August 29, 2018Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal
Date: February 28, 2017Judgment
Date: January 26, 2017Judgment
Date: January 24, 2017Motion hearings
Date: January 11, 2017Order to Show Cause
Date: December 08, 2016Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: October 18, 2016Statement
Date: October 13, 2016Settlement Conference
Date: August 25, 2016Document
Date: May 04, 2016Document
Date: April 11, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: February 17, 2016Order
Date: February 10, 2016Document
Date: February 10, 2016Conversion Action
Date: December 23, 2015Declaration
Date: December 03, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 19, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: SACRAMENTOStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 06/19/2018Amount: $80,02 Writ of Execution Return County: SACRAMENTO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 06/19/2018 Amount: $80,025.00 |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: San MateoStatus: Partially SatisfiedIssued on: 1/24/17Amount: $8 Writ of Execution Return County: San Mateo Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 1/24/17 Amount: $80,025 |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability of Counsel ATTORNEY MARK C. WATSON UNAVAILABLE DECEMBER 23 - 31, 2019 Notice of Unavailability of Counsel ATTORNEY MARK C. WATSON UNAVAILABLE DECEMBER 23 - 31, 2019 |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Partially Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Partially Satisfied |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 9,028 Credit: 63,095.41 Interest: 0 |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption Certified copy forwarded to Levying Officer of: SACRAMENTO COUN Order Determining Claim of Exemption Certified copy forwarded to Levying Officer of: SACRAMENTO COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE. Copies mailed to all parties. |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Claim of Exemption 10/10/2018 Claim of Exemption Judge: Etezadi, Susan I. |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Claim of Exemption |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.