Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cohcran, Connor, Conlan Press, Incorporated, Lake, Patrick, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Carmichael, John H, against Does 1-30, Lake, Patrick, represented by Helbraun, David M, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with V. Raymond Swope presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeV. Raymond Swope Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management114 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category(13) Unlimited Defamation |
Time To Trial1034 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1527 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1511 days |
This complaint is filed by Connor Cochran and Conlan Press, Incorporated against unknown defendants. The plaintiffs allege that the defendants published false written statements about them online, including accusations of committing crimes and failin...
Order Denying
Date: February 15, 2019Separate Statement
Date: October 31, 2016Ex Parte Application
Date: January 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON ATTORNEY JEREMY W KATZ Proof of Service by MAIL OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON ATTORNEY JEREMY W KATZ |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail returned undelivered (unscanned) NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment (AMENDED) JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT PATRICK LAKE ON CONLAN PRESS, INC. COMPLAINT Judgment (AMENDED) JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT PATRICK LAKE ON CONLAN PRESS, INC. COMPLAINT |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ReOpened | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs $32,041.72 Memorandum of Costs |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) AND MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) served Proof of Service by MAIL of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) AND MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) served on JEREMY W. JATZ AND PAUL J. MASNDORF |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT ON CONLAN PRESS, INC. COMPLAINT Judgment IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT ON CONLAN PRESS, INC. COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.