Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barroso, Abhay Chand, Sharma, Praneeta D, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carpenter, Zuckerman & Rowley,Llp, against Aristondo, Juan Francisco, Barroso, Eduardo Gutierrez, Eduardos Llc, Gutierrez, Maria, represented by Stock, David J., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with John L. Grandsaert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Grandsaert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management115 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial335 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time493 days |
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Abhayciled Sharma and Praneeta D. Sharma against Eduardos, LLC, Juan Francisco Aristondo, Eduardo Gutierrez Barroso, Maega Gutierrez, and Does 1 through 100. The plaintiffs allege that the defendants ...
Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 06, 2015Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: May 06, 2016Conversion Action
Date: April 01, 2016Ex Parte
Date: January 14, 2016Notice
Date: September 10, 2015Ex Parte Application
Date: September 02, 2015Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: August 20, 2015Declaration
Date: July 06, 2015Motion
Date: July 06, 2015Document
Date: April 22, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: April 10, 2015Complaint
Date: December 30, 2014Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 03, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EDUARDOS LLC. Conversion Action NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EDUARDOS LLC. |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 8 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 8 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 21 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIV 531934 - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING 5/17/16. Document IMGDOC: CIV 531934 - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING 5/17/16. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.