Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
De Cristoferi, Leslie, Hughes, Frank, Sr, Hughes, Rosalie, Jackson, Lynn, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Zoucha, Joseph R., against Ascani, Dominic, Mclaren, Marcia Kathryne, represented by Rendler, Devereaux, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert D. Foiles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management115 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial336 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time387 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo. The plaintiffs are Frank Hughes, Sr., Rosalie Hughes, Leslie De Cristoferi, and Lynn Jackson. The defendants are Marcia Kathryn McLaren and Dominic Asc...
Answer (Unlimited)
Date: March 19, 2015Complaint
Date: December 29, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: April 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIV 531898 - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING 2/23/16. Document IMGDOC: CIV 531898 - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING 2/23/16. |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JCR1: HONORABLE ROBERT D. FOILES, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: ALEXANDRINA ORTEGA. COURT REPORTER: NONE. Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY A ORTEGA ON 01/06/16. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.