Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sholander, Neil M., against Lieberman, Jeff, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Steven L. Dylina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven L. Dylina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management155 days |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2013 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions460 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time460 days |
Complaint
Date: March 07, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: July 12, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: October 16, 2013Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: June 10, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY NEIL SHOLANDER FILED Notice of Change of Address of Attorney NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY NEIL SHOLANDER FILED |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CACH LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 06/10/14 AS FOLLOWS: Judgment by Clerk JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 06/10/14 AS FOLLOWS: |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ACCRUED INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CACH LLC Declaration DS: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ACCRUED INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CACH LLC |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY CACH LLC Declaration DECL: DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY CACH LLC |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $115,749.43 |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute INT: INTEREST IS $22,384.76. |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COSTS: COSTS ARE $495.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.