Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Zook, Hazel, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Beechen, Paul D, against Soteras, Alex, Mullens, Laura, International Fidelity Insurance Company, represented by Rolin, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Ventura.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2018 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseVentura |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2007 | Hearing |
Jury Trial (LC) 5 Days Estimated time |
|
December 13, 2007 | Hearing | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
November 27, 2007 | Action | Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 12/13/2007 at 01:30:00 PM in 22 was vacated. | |
November 27, 2007 | Action | Jury Trial (LC) - 5 Days Estimated time scheduled for 12/31/2007 at 01:30:00 PM in 42 was vacated. | |
November 27, 2007 | Action | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 27, 2007 | Action | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 27, 2007 | Action | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by ZOOK, HAZEL on 11/27/2007. | |
November 26, 2007 | Action | Notice - Other (of Withdrawl of Lis Pendens) filed by ZOOK, HAZEL on 11/26/2007. | |
August 31, 2007 | Action | Association of Attorney filed by ZOOK, HAZEL on 08/31/2007. | |
August 06, 2007 | Action | Jury Trial (LC) - 5 Days Estimated time scheduled for 12/31/2007 at 01:30:00 PM in 42 at Ventura. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.