Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jacobs, Kurtis A., against Herrera, Maria R, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions75 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4426 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied,Ventura County,2/27/07) filed by DISCOVER BANK on 01/23/2008. | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event | 02/27/2007: --- Credits in the amount of $0.00. | |
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event | 02/27/2007: Writ of Execution for Money Issued for Ventura County in the amount of $14916.44 | |
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event | 02/27/2007: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by DISCOVER BANK (Issuing writ of attachment, writ of mandate, writ of execution, writ of sale, writ of possession, writ of prohibition, writ of restitution or other enforcement) Receipt Number: 702270219 for $15.0 | |
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event | 02/27/2007: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment (total of all postjudgment costs $51.00), Acknowledgment of Credit (total credit to date $0.00) and Declaration of Accrued Interest (amount of $1236.71) filed by DISCOVER BANK | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/21/2006: Writ of Execution for Money (Limited) Issued for Ventura County in the amount of $13737.09 | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/21/2006: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment (total of all postjudgment costs $0.00), Acknowledgment of Credit (total credit to date $0.00) and Declaration of Accrued Interest (amount of $108.36) filed by DISCOVER BANK | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/21/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by DISCOVER BANK (Issuing writ of attachment, writ of mandate, writ of execution, writ of sale, writ of possession, writ of prohibition, writ of restitution or other enforcement) Receipt Number: 604210206 for $15.0 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.