Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
West Shore Collections Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Landsman, Philip, against Whalig, Sharon, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryOther Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions223 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4426 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of submitted by WEST SHORE COLLECTIONS INC rejected on 04/08/2009. | |
August 17, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/17/2006: Abstract of Judgment issued and copy filed | |
August 17, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/17/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by WEST SHORE COLLECTIONS INC (Issuing abstract of judgment) Receipt Number: 608170213 for $15.0 | |
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/14/2006: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE A CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ( WEST SHORE COLLECTIONS INC). Hearing: VACATED | |
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/14/2006: (S) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT Hearing: VACATED | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/10/2006: Attorney fees are $660.00 | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/10/2006: Request for Entry of Default and CLERKS Judgment on COMPLAINT of WEST SHORE COLLECTIONS INC as to defendant/cross-defendant(s) SHARON WHALIG filed by WEST SHORE COLLECTIONS INC | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/10/2006: EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JMT filed by WEST SHORE COLLECTIONS INC | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/10/2006: Judgment After Default by Clerk entered on 08/10/06 as follows: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.