Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Regents Of The University Of California, Hazlett, Frazer, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Fox, Jamie Beth, Loskamp, Edwin D, against State Of California Departmentof, J. Mcloughlin Engineering Co.,Inc., represented by Barney, Patrick H, Phillips, David M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2005 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Time To Trial550 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions552 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time2771 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by HAZLETT, FRAZER on 04/11/2008. | |
October 01, 2007 | Time Estimate: 7 Days | ||
August 07, 2007 | Re: PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | ||
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference heard 08/07/2007 08:30:00 AM. | |
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Matter was taken off calendar. | |
July 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - Re: PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE scheduled for 08/07/2007 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura | |
July 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - Time Estimate: 7 Days scheduled for 07/05/2007 at 09:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura. | |
July 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - Re: PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE scheduled for 08/07/2007 at 08:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura | |
July 05, 2007 | Time Estimate: 7 Days |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.