Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gemini Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Katz, Michael I., against Cortez, Maryanne, Cortez, Edward, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions12 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time4427 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 01/20/2013. | |
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/02/2006: Writ of Possession ( REAL PROPERTY ) issued to Ventura County RETURNED and filed | |
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/10/2006: Judgment for possession of premises located at 560 W CHANNEL ISLANDS BLVD #12 OXNARD CA. 93033 | |
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/10/2006: Request for Entry of Default and CLERK'S Judgment on COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) of GEMINI LLC as to defendant/cross-defendant(s) ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS filed by GEMINI LLC | |
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/10/2006: Judgment After Default by Clerk for Possession of Premises: | |
January 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/10/2006: Judgment entered on COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) of GEMINI LLC for GEMINI LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.