Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Susan Davia, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Gregory M. Sheffer, against Hallmart Collectibles, Inc., Macy'S Merchandising Group, Inc., Macy'S West Stores, Inc., Macy'S Inc., represented by Sibira Sherman, David V. Roth, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2020 | Action | JURY FEE DEPOSIT DEFT, MACY'S MERCHANDISING GROUP, INC. - 150.00 | |
January 17, 2020 | Hearing |
MINUTE ORDER POSTED - Appearance: 01/17/2020 at 9:00AM for CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES CHOU FOR ANDREW SWEET |
|
December 19, 2019 | Action | FILING FEE PROCESSED: DEFT, MACY'S MERCHANDISING GROUP, INC. - 435.00 | |
December 19, 2019 | Action | ANSWER DEFT, MACY'S MERCHANDISING GROUP, INC. | |
December 19, 2019 | Action | FILING FEE PROCESSED: DEFT, MACY'S INC. - 435.00 | |
December 19, 2019 | Action | ANSWER DEFT, MACY'S INC. | |
December 09, 2019 | Hearing |
MINUTE ORDER POSTED - Appearance: 12/09/2019 at 9:00AM for OSC RE: FILING OF ANSWER
Judge: ANDREW SWEET |
|
October 31, 2019 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 11/08/2019 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D14 DROP REASON: PROOFS OF SERVICE FILED | |
October 18, 2019 | Action | FILING FEE REMOVED DEFT, MACY'S INC. | |
October 18, 2019 | Action | ANSWER REMOVED DEFT, MACY'S INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.