Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Elena Stoyanov, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Robert Selvidge, against David L. Richards, Helen Richards, represented by Trina Noel Dresden, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 1997 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 1999 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
July 15, 1999 | Action | STIPULATED JUDGMENT: PLTF., ELENA STOYANOV SHALL DISMISS HER COMPLAINT, WITH PREJUDICE, AGAINST DEFT(S) DAVID L. RICHARDS AND HELEN RICHARDS; BY HON. WM. T. MC GIVERN | |
July 15, 1999 | Action | CASE DISPOSED BEFORE TRIAL - OTHER JUDGMENTS | |
May 24, 1999 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
August 28, 1998 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
June 30, 1998 | Action | FROM TIME: 09:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: SCCV FROM DEPARTMENT: II ENTERED BY: CS | |
June 30, 1998 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
May 28, 1998 | Action | FROM TIME: 9:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: SCCV FROM DEPARTMENT: II ENTERED BY: CS | |
May 28, 1998 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
February 04, 1998 | Action | IT IS ORDERED: (OVERRULING DEFENDANT], DEMURRER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.