Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Audrey Maxwell, filed a(n) Civil case against Aztec Brokerage, Inc., Stephen Reed, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 1997 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2000 | Action | CASE FILE IMAGED | |
September 17, 1997 | Action | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED, AS TO: AUDREY MAXWELL PRO PER | |
September 10, 1997 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 12/29/1997 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: SCCV IN DEPARTMENT: 03 DROP REASON: CASE DISMISSED 9-9-97 | |
September 10, 1997 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 12/04/1997 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: 03 DROP REASON: CASE DISMISSED 9-9-97 | |
September 10, 1997 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 10/23/1997 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: 03 DROP REASON: CASE DISMISSED 9-9-97 | |
September 09, 1997 | Action | CASE DISPOSED IN ENTIRETY | |
September 09, 1997 | Action | CASE DISPOSED BEFORE TRIAL; DISMISSED - OTHER REASONS | |
September 09, 1997 | Action | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED, AS TO: AUDREY MAXWELL | |
August 22, 1997 | Action | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED, AS TO: AZTEC BROKERAGE INC. | |
August 11, 1997 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 12/29/1997 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: SCCV IN DEPARTMENT: 03 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.