Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Mary Coughlin, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Glenn Allen Lerner, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2004 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2007 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
December 04, 2006 | Action | APPEARANCE MOVED TO: 01/22/2007 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: PROB IN DEPARTMENT: 01 MOVE REASON: JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT FROM DATE: 01/22/2007 FROM TIME: 09:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: PROB FROM DEPARTMENT: 04 | |
December 04, 2006 | Action | CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE HON. JAMES R. RITCHIE | |
July 17, 2006 | Action | PROOF OF SERIVICE BY MAIL 6-30-06 | |
January 23, 2006 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
January 17, 2006 | Action | APPEARANCE MOVED TO: 01/22/2007 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: PROB IN DEPARTMENT: 04 MOVE REASON: CONT TO 1/22/2007 FROM DATE: 01/23/2006 FROM TIME: 09:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: PROB FROM DEPARTMENT: 04 | |
December 19, 2005 | Action | APPEARANCE MOVED TO: 01/23/2006 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: PROB IN DEPARTMENT: 04 MOVE REASON: JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT FROM DATE: 01/23/2006 FROM TIME: 09:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: PROB FROM DEPARTMENT: VI | |
December 19, 2005 | Action | CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE HON. MICHAEL B. DUFFICY | |
November 15, 2005 | Action | APPEARANCE MOVED TO: 01/23/2006 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: PROB IN DEPARTMENT: VI MOVE REASON: CONT TO 1/23/06 FROM DATE: 12/19/2005 FROM TIME: 09:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: PROB FROM DEPARTMENT: VI | |
October 12, 2004 | Action | IT IS ORDERED: SPOUSAL PROPERTY ORDER GRANTED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.