Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Terrance Hoy, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Carl Bergman Shapiro, against County Of Marin, represented by Nancy Stuart Grisham, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2004 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2005 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 09/27/2005 AT: 09:30 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: STLC IN DEPARTMENT: 08 DROP REASON: CASE DISPOSED BY SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
August 22, 2005 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 10/06/2005 AT: 09:30 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: TRCL IN DEPARTMENT: 08 DROP REASON: SUMMARY JUDGMENT GRANTED | |
August 17, 2005 | Action | BY ATTORNEY FOR DEFT. COUNTY OF MARIN FOR COSTS OF $455.00 | |
August 12, 2005 | Action | CASE DISPOSED IN ENTIRETY | |
August 12, 2005 | Action | CASE DISPOSED BEFORE TRIAL - SUMMARY JUDGMENT JUDGMENT FOR DEFT. COUNTY OF MARIN AND AGAINST PLTF. TERRANCE HOY. PLTF IS NOT ENTITLED TO QUIET TITLE, DECLARATORY RELIEF, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF OR ANY OTHER RELIEF IN THIS ACTION. DEFT. SHALL RECOVER ITS COSTS AGAINST PLTF. HON. JOHN A. SUTRO, JR | |
August 12, 2005 | Action | IT IS ORDERED: GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. HON. JOHN A. SUTRO, JR. | |
August 12, 2005 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
July 12, 2005 | Action | APPEARANCE MOVED TO: 08/12/2005 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV IN DEPARTMENT: 08 MOVE REASON: PER STEVEN PERL FR.8-19 TO 8-12 FROM DATE: 08/19/2005 FROM TIME: 09:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV FROM DEPARTMENT: 08 | |
June 13, 2005 | Action | APPEARANCE MOVED TO: 08/19/2005 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV IN DEPARTMENT: 08 MOVE REASON: CLERICAL ERROR. MUST BE LEFT ON 8-19. 8-26 IS FULL RE:MSJ'S FROM DATE: 08/26/2005 FROM TIME: 09:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV FROM DEPARTMENT: 08 | |
June 13, 2005 | Action | APPEARANCE MOVED TO: 08/26/2005 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV IN DEPARTMENT: 08 MOVE REASON: PER STEVE PERL , ESQ. FR.8-19 TO 8-26 FROM DATE: 08/19/2005 FROM TIME: 09:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV FROM DEPARTMENT: 08 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.