Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Porfidio M. Zacarias H, Santiaga E. De Leon, filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2004 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2004 | Action | CERTIFIED COPY OF DECREE CHANGING NAME, AMENDMENT OF BIRTH RECORD TO REFLECT COURT ORDER CHANGE OF NAME & $20.00 MONEY ORDER MAILED TO STATE THIS DATE. | |
July 02, 2004 | Action | IT IS ORDERED: THE COURT ORDERS THE NAME OF GALILLANO FEDERICO DE LEON REYES IS CHANGED TO GALY GALIANO ZACARIAS DE LEON | |
July 02, 2004 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
June 18, 2004 | Action | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED, AS TO: MINR, GALILLANO DE LEON REYES PROOF OF PUBLICATION 05/28/04 | |
May 21, 2004 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 07/02/2004 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: DFCV IN DEPARTMENT: 07 | |
May 21, 2004 | Action | COMPLAINT/FIRST PAPER | |
May 21, 2004 | Action | PAUPERIS FILING GRANTED PETR, PORFIDIO ZACARIAS H | |
May 21, 2004 | Action | CASE OPEN / ACTIVE STATUS HON. LYNN DURYEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.