Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Michael Digulla, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Thomas C. Tagliarini, against Karin Von Ahn, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2003 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2003 | Action | CASE DISPOSED IN ENTIRETY | |
October 28, 2003 | Action | CASE DISPOSED BEFORE TRIAL - OTHER JUDGMENTS JUDGMENT BY CLERK BY DEFAULT THAT PLAINTIFF, MICHAEL DIGULLA, TRUSTEE FOR THE DIGULLA FAMILY TRUST, RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT, KARIN VON AHN, THE TOTAL SUM OF $71,394.69. | |
October 28, 2003 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 12/18/2003 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: CMGT IN DEPARTMENT: 04 DROP REASON: DEFAULT JUDGMENT TAKEN | |
October 28, 2003 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 11/07/2003 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: 04 DROP REASON: DEFAULT TAKEN | |
October 28, 2003 | Action | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED, AS TO: DEFT, KARIN VON AHN | |
October 07, 2003 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 10/09/2003 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: 04 DROP REASON: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED | |
October 02, 2003 | Action | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED, AS TO: DEFT, KARIN VON AHN BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 8/6/03 | |
July 31, 2003 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 12/18/2003 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: CMGT IN DEPARTMENT: 04 | |
July 31, 2003 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 11/07/2003 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: 04 | |
July 31, 2003 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 10/09/2003 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: 04 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.