Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martinez, Frances, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tara Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTara Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryElder/Adult Dependent Abuse |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Comment: POS |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: ELDER ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER TARA REILLY,JUDGE CLERK: ERIN MUELLER COURT REPORTER KIM MCGILVARY;11522 COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY RUSSEL KINER PRESENT FOR PETITIONER. ATTORNEY SHELBY SHELTON PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) PETITION DENIED - THE COURT NOTES THAT THE PETITION IS NOT THE APPROPRIATE VEHICLE FOR THE REMEDY BEING SOUGHT AS AN ELDER ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER CANNOT PROTECT ASSETS IN AN ESTATE. - ATTORNEY SHELBY SHELTON TO PREPARE APPROPRIATE ORDER AND SUBMIT IT DIRECTLY TO THE DEPARTMENT. COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - ELDER/DEPENDANT ADULT ABUSE OF FRANCES MARTINEZ ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Notes - Hearing Date of HRG OF 04/05/21 - PROBATE NOTES |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temp Restraining Order - Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Comment: ELDER SERVICE PACKET AVAILABLE FOR PICKUP IN PRO PER BIN "K";TINA MARTIN WILL BE PICKING UP. |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes EX PARTE HEARING REGARDING ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE SCOTT E SEELEY,COMMISSIONER CLERK: DIANA ROBLES NOT REPORTED BAILIFF: R DURAN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY RUSSELL KINER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PETITIONER FRANCES MARTINEZ PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KATE FALCAO - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR EX-PARTE RE: ELDER/DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE. PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. DECLARATION REGARDING EXPARTE NOTICE FILED. EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED NO EMERGENCY - SET FOR HEARING ONLY COUNSEL IS TO PROVIDE AUTHORITY IN ORDER FOR COURT TO GRANT PERMANENT ORDERS. COURT FURTHER ORDERS THIS CASE TRANSFERRED TO THE SAN BERNARDINO JUSTICE COURT TO COORDINATE WITH PROPS2000670. THE COURT NOW ORDERS THIS CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT (S37) FOR ALL PURPOSES. (040521; 10:00AM; S37) PETITIONER/PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE ALL DOCUMENTS LISTED ON THE PROOF OF SERVICE TO THE RESPONDENT/DEFENDANT AND FILE THE PROOF OF SERVICE TEN (10) DAYS PRIOR TO NEXT HEARING. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. S37 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Comment: ***CLETS 001 SENT TO SBJC PROBATE TO FOLLOW CASE FOR HEARING ON 04/05/21 DEPT S37*** |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.