Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
281 Ellis Street Llc, Watchful, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Quazzo, Marco, against Does 1 To 10, Watchful Inc., Watchful, Inc., represented by Gluck, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel K. Feng Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the law firm Bartko Zankel Bunzel & Miller on behalf of their client, 281 Ellis Street, LLC. The complaint is against Watchful, Inc., a Delaware corporation, and seeks summary judgment or summary adjudicati...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-14-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100146877) FILED BY DEFENDANT WATCHFUL, INC. | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100143518) | |
October 04, 2021 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-04-2021 - CASE SETTLED. NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED 8/20/21. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON DEC-14-2021 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
September 23, 2021 | Hearing |
JUDICIAL MEDIATION
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
September 03, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Friday, Sep. 03, 2021, line 3. 1-DEFENDANT WATCHFUL, INC.'s MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication. OFF CALE... | |
September 03, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Friday, Sep. 03, 2021, line 3. 2-PLAINTIFF 281 ELLIS STREET LLC's MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication As To... | |
September 03, 2021 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.