Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ajiataz-Mazariegos, Gregoria F., filed a(n) Wage and Hour - Labor and Employment case represented by Darabi, Parviz, against Does 1 To 30, Inclusive, Hcsg West Llc, Hcsg West, Llc., A Limited Liability Company, Healthcare Services Group, Inc., Healthcare Services Group, Inc., A California, (total of 5) See All represented by Moore, Steven W, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2020 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints (Failure To Pay Overtime Wages, Failure To Pay Minimum Wages And Secret Underpayment Of Wages, Failure To Pay Minimum Wages, Etc) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeWage and Hour |
This complaint alleges various violations by the defendants, Healthcare Services Group, Inc. and HCSG West, LLC, along with unnamed defendants, of California labor laws. The plaintiff, Gregoria F. Ajiataz-Mazariegos, claims that the defendants failed...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-22-2020 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100102980) FILED BY ATTORNEY DARABI, PARVIZ | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 100100260) FILED BY DEFENDANT HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. HCSG WEST LLC | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100100105) FILED BY DEFENDANT HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. HCSG WEST LLC | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AJIATAZ-MAZARIEGOS, GREGORIA F. AS TO DEFENDANT HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HCSG WEST, LLC., A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 TO 30, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-22-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-20-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-29-2020 | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.