Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Gottschalk, Erika, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Boulos, Rozy Lahlouh, Wu, Annie C, against Does 1 To 10, Lance, Elizabeth J., represented by Bettencourt, Anthony M., Geary, John Finlaw, Tran, L. Judiee, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel K. Feng Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons document in a legal case. It is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff/petitioner is Erika Gottschalk and the defendant/respondent is Elizabeth J. Lance. The d...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 24, 2019ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100091277) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANCE, ELIZABETH J.
Date: December 11, 2019REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-18-2021 - NOT HELD AND REMOVED (0.5)
Date: October 13, 2021ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: July 17, 2020ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: February 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-11-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 67173361) | |
November 22, 2021 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-10-2021 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JAN-11-2022 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. JUDGE: ANGELA BRADSTREET; CLERK: J. GUANDIQUE. NOT REPORTED. (D624) | |
November 10, 2021 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANGELA BRADSTREET |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-22-2021 VACATED. CASE SETTLED. JUDGE: ANGELA BRADSTREET; CLERK: J. GUANDIQUE. NOT REPORTED. (D624) | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOV-10-2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 624. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING SET FOR NOV-10-2021 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 624 | |
October 25, 2021 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.