Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brown, Janet Lorraine, against Does 1 To 10 Inclusive, Gomez, Phillip M, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions207 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2020 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-23-2020 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 65632656) | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-23-2020 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64434507) FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64379744) FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT GOMEZ, PHILLIP M DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-15-2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.