Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Auffret, Olivier, Leclair, Virginie, Lendormy, Jeanyves, Lendormy, Jean-Yves, Luscutoff, Lendormy & Associates, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Fellner, Jason E., Lendormy, Jean-Yves Pierre, Wolff, George William, against Auffret, Olivier, Leclair, Virginie, Lendormy, Jean-Yves, Luscutoff, Lendormy & Associates, represented by Fellner, Jason E., Wolff, George William, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Suzanne Ramos Bolanos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSuzanne Ramos Bolanos Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2019 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions233 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. It is a notice of motion and motion to strike the first amended cross-complaint of Olivier Auffret and Virginie LeClair. The motion is filed by the...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - CT: 14 VOLS VIA ECART, NOTE SEALED DOCUMENTS SENT TO COA ONLY; RT: 11 VOLS VIA ECART [APPEAL FILED 12/29/22, A166950 DIV 2] | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - CT: 11 VOLS VIA ECART, NOTE SEALED DOCUMENTS SENT TO COA ONLY; RT: 11 VOLS VIA ECART [APPEAL FILED 12/29/22, A166950 DIV 2] | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED (TRANSACTION ID # 69614771) BY APPELLANT LECLAIR, VIRGINIE | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED (TRANSACTION ID # 69594451) (TRANSACTION ID # 69594451) BY RESPONDENT LUSCUTOFF, LENDORMY & ASSOCIATES LENDORMY, JEAN-YVES | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL - REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (APPEAL FILED 12/29/22) | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 12/29/22) | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $3,075.00 (APPEAL FILED 12/29/22) | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO APPELLANT, ESTIMATED COST $6,050.00 - $6,150.00 LESS $100.00 (APPEAL FILED 12/29/22) | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.