Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Benson, Susan M, against Chris' Discount Muffler & Brake Inc. Dba, Does 1 To 5, Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions179 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time190 days |
This complaint was electronically filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco on June 26, 2019. The clerk of the court, Yolanda Tabo-Ramirez, processed the filing.
Unfortunately, the provided text does not contain any dollar ...
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 200002749) FILED BY ATTORNEY BENSON, SUSAN M
Date: November 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2019 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-11-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200002749) | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 200002749) FILED BY ATTORNEY BENSON, SUSAN M | |
October 23, 2019 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-23-2019 CONTINUED TO DEC-11-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100047403), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED JUN-05-2019, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-06-2019 AS TO DEFENDANT CHRIS' DISCOUNT MUFFLER & BRAKE INC. DBA THE SMOG SHOP | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT CHRIS' DISCOUNT MUFFLER & BRAKE INC. DBA THE SMOG SHOP DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-23-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-19-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-30-2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.