Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Anderson, Jacques, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcdonald, Elizabeth F, against Chin, Justin, Does 1 To 25, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel K. Feng Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions440 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
This complaint is filed by the City and County of San Francisco as an intervenor in a case against Justin Chin and Does 1 to 25. The complaint alleges that the defendants are responsible for injuries sustained by Jacques Anderson, who was employed by...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2021 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-09-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100118456) | |
December 08, 2020 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-08-2020 CONTINUED TO MAR-09-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-06-2020 CONTINUED TO DEC-08-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 04, 2020 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-04-2020 CONTINUED TO OCT-06-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 65702611) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.