Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Patton Sullivan Brodehl Llp, Umpqua Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brodehl, Kevin R., Cole, Peter, Manasian, Paul Edward, Pro Per, Shelton, Charles E., (total of 9) See All against Does 1 To 30, Inclusive, Xelan Prop 1, Llc., Singer, Kevin, Umpqua Bank, represented by Brodehl, Kevin R., Cole, Peter, Manasian, Paul Edward, Pro Per, Shelton, Charles E., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Charles F. Haines presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles F. Haines Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a Verified Answer filed by Defendant XELAN PROP 1, LLC in response to a complaint filed by Plaintiff UMPQUA BANK. The defendant denies most of the allegations in the complaint, stating that they are legal conclusions to which no res...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Thursday, April 4, 2024, Line 16, RECEIVER KEVIN SINGER's Motion For Termination Of Receivership Release Of Remaining Receivership Estate Funds And Authorizatio... | |
March 21, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for March 21, 2024 line 1. OTHER KEVIN SINGER NOTICE OF MOTION FOR TERMINATION OF RECEIVERSHIP RELEASE OF REMAINING RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE FUNDS AND AU... | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVERS JULY 2023 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES (TRANSACTION ID # 210046004) FILED BY OTHER SINGER, KEVIN (RECEIVER) | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE TO SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVERS JULY 2023 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES (TRANSACTION ID # 210046004) FILED BY OTHER SINGER, KEVIN (RECEIVER) | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS 1-3 TO SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVERS JULY 2023 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES (TRANSACTION ID # 210046004) FILED BY OTHER SINGER, KEVIN (RECEIVER) | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS 1-7 TO SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVERS APRIL - JUNE 2023 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES (TRANSACTION ID # 210043288) FILED BY OTHER SINGER, KEVIN (RECEIVER) | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVERS APRIL - JUNE 2023 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES (NOTICES) (TRANSACTION ID # 210043288) FILED BY OTHER SINGER, KEVIN (RECEIVER) | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE TO SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVERS APRIL - JUNE 2023 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES (TRANSACTION ID # 210043288) FILED BY OTHER SINGER, KEVIN (RECEIVER) | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS 1-3 TO SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVERS MARCH 2023 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES (TRANSACTION ID # 210034479) FILED BY OTHER SINGER, KEVIN (RECEIVER) | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVERS MARCH 2023 REPORT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO PAY RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES (NOTICES) (TRANSACTION ID # 210034479) FILED BY OTHER SINGER, KEVIN (RECEIVER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.