Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Harrison, Deanna, Harrison, Patrick, Young Dds, Michael, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Heffernan, Brian J, against Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Pacific Gas And Electric Company, Pacific Gas & Electric Company, Pg&E Corporation, represented by Eggleton, Keith E, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeri L. Jackson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2017 |
CategoryEminent Domain |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Case Cycle Time421 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 66292455) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62949042) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 62949042) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY | |
May 16, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-16-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP 4955. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61757319) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COORDINATION AND STAY ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 61757319) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 61694722) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRISON, PATRICK HARRISON, DEANNA YOUNG DDS, MICHAEL | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61694383), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRISON, PATRICK HARRISON, DEANNA YOUNG DDS, MICHAEL SERVED JAN-19-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61631979) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.