Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Reviver Financial, Llc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Booska, Steven Alfred, against Does 1 To 10, Izing, Gary, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 16, 2017 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions137 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time187 days |
This complaint document is an amended proof of service of summons in a legal case between Reviver Financial, LLC, Successor in Interest to CNU of California, LLC dba NETCREDIT as the plaintiff and Gary Izing as the defendant. The case number is CGC17...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF REVIVER FINANCIAL, LLC. SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO CNU OF CALIFORNIA, LLC. D/B/A/ NETCREDIT RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT IZING, GARY $4,994.17 PRINCIPAL, $309.60 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,303.77, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18088009) AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION 585 (TRANSACTION ID # 18088009) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REVIVER FINANCIAL, LLC. SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO CNU OF CALIFORNIA, LLC. D/B/A/ NETCREDIT | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 18088009) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REVIVER FINANCIAL, LLC. SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO CNU OF CALIFORNIA, LLC. D/B/A/ NETCREDIT | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, COURT JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $309.60 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 (TRANSACTION ID # 18088009) AS TO DEFENDANT IZING, GARY | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE LOST DOCS (TRANSACTION ID # 18088009) FILED BY PLAINTIFF REVIVER FINANCIAL, LLC. SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO CNU OF CALIFORNIA, LLC. D/B/A/ NETCREDIT | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18088009), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF REVIVER FINANCIAL, LLC. SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO CNU OF CALIFORNIA, LLC. D/B/A/ NETCREDIT SERVED DEC-19-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE DEC-20-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT IZING, GARY | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 18065032) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF REVIVER FINANCIAL, LLC. SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO CNU OF CALIFORNIA, LLC. D/B/A/ NETCREDIT AS TO DEFENDANT IZING, GARY | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18037009), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF REVIVER FINANCIAL, LLC. SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO CNU OF CALIFORNIA, LLC. D/B/A/ NETCREDIT SERVED DEC-19-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE DEC-20-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT IZING, GARY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.