Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wang, Jerry, against Mees, Sean L, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2017 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time529 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63021304)
Date: March 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2019 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-12-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63021304) | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: COMPLIANCE WITH C.C.P. SECTION 1033 (TRANSACTION ID # 63001416) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE NON-ACTIVE MILITARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 63001416) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MEES, SEAN L $3,106.56 PRINCIPAL, $297.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,403.56, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63001416) | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 63001416) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $297.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $215.00 (TRANSACTION ID # 63001416) AS TO DEFENDANT MEES, SEAN L | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REQUESTING THAT THE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON JANUARY 2, 2018 BE SET ASIDE, AND TO REINSTATE CASE TO ACTIVE LITIGATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 62850615) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-08-2019 CONTINUED TO MAR-12-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.