Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Funding Llc As Assignee Of Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Morales, Roger, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 11, 2017 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions255 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time374 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MORALES, ROGER AKA ROGER R. MORALES $4,712.19 PRINCIPAL, $374.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,086.19, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61946593) AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT (CCP 1033) (TRANSACTION ID # 61946593) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, COURT JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $374.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 (TRANSACTION ID # 61946593) AS TO DEFENDANT MORALES, ROGER AKA ROGER R. MORALES | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF AARON BACKES IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61946593) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT (CCP §1033) (TRANSACTION ID # 61946593) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61583454), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK SERVED DEC-21-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MORALES, ROGER AKA ROGER R. MORALES | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING NON-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100030145) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.