Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Layman, Patrick J, against Macfarland, Leanna L, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 03, 2017 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time898 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Discover Bank against Leanna L MacFarland. The complaint alleges two causes of action: open book account and account stated. Discover Bank claims that Leanna L MacFarland became indebted to them on a credit...
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 100030776) FILED BY ATTORNEY LAYMAN, PATRICK J
Date: November 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT MACFARLAND, LEANNA L | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MACFARLAND, LEANNA L | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $50.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $568.78 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100040741) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MACFARLAND, LEANNA L | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $91.36 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 18056047) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033 (TRANSACTION ID # 100030776) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (TRANSACTION ID # 100030776) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.