Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Konami, Kim, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Konami, Neal Hideo, against Davani, Aryan, Davani, Delilah, Davani, Mahmood, Davani Marble, Inc., Does 1 To 25, (total of 23) See All represented by Corliss, Nicolet, De La Pena, Gregory Ramon, Kithas, John Andrew, Pro Per, Tse, Frank M., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions796 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1420 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in the case of Kim Konami v. Aryan Davani et al. The case number is CGC-15-548211. The attorney representing the plaintiff is Neal H. Konami, Esq. The request for dismissal is made to the clerk of the Superio...
ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A JUDGE PRO TEM.
Date: August 23, 2018DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15333001) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KONAMI, KIM
Date: November 30, 2015ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE TRUE NAMES FOR DOE 1 & DOE 2 DEFENDANTS
Date: January 22, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62707144)
Date: November 29, 2018DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100039633) AS TO DEFENDANT NILSEN, ANNIKA
Date: November 29, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MILLER, ALEX
Date: February 16, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62791986)
Date: December 20, 2018NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 30, 2015ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAVANI, ARYAN
Date: November 03, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL / BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL RE: ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT KONTRIDZE, GEORGE
Date: November 03, 2015ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DUNNELL, KEVIN F.
Date: November 03, 2015ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KONTRIDZE, GEORGE
Date: November 03, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE OF ARYAN DAVANI'S ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT DAVANI, ARYAN
Date: November 03, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL / BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL RE: ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT DUNNELL, KEVIN F.
Date: November 03, 2015ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT METZ, DANIEL
Date: November 12, 2015EXHIBIT G (TRANSACTION ID # 15328084) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KONAMI, KIM
Date: November 30, 2015PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 17285060) FILED BY DEFENDANT YEE, CAROL
Date: October 13, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 62657020) FILED BY ATTORNEY TSE, FRANK M.
Date: November 09, 2018NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100039472) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KONAMI, KIM
Date: November 21, 2018AMENDED PROF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 62460881) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAVANI, ARYAN
Date: September 17, 2018ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 20, 2019ORDER GRANTING ANNIKA RODRIGUEZ MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: February 20, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60999693) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAVANI MARBLE, INC.
Date: August 17, 2017ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DMV'S PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: February 24, 2016PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16055016) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KONAMI, KIM
Date: February 25, 2016DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100048436)
Date: July 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64113959) FILED BY DEFENDANT YEE, JAYNE Y. YEE, DAVID SHAWN YEE, CAROL | |
August 13, 2019 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-13-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | POST-HEARING FILING AND SUBMISSION OF THE REDACTED VERSION OF THE PARTIES' "CONFIDENTIAL FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RELEASE" ATTACHED HERETO AS "EXHIBIT A" (TRANSACTION ID # 100048436) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KONAMI, KIM | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100048436) | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES REQUEST FOR RETENTION OF COURT JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 TO ENFORCE TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT HEARD ON JUN 26, 2019 (ENDORSED COPY RETURNED IN SASE) | |
June 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Request Of Parties For Retention Of Court Jurisdiction Pursuant To Ccp Section 664.6 To Enforce Terms Of Settlement Agreement; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Neal H. Konami; And Proof Of Service
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-26-2019 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501,COURT HAVING REVIEWED THE PLEADINGS AND HAVING HEARD ORAL ARGUMENTS RULES AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFF KIM KONAMI REQUEST OF PARTIES FOR RETENTION OF COURT JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 664.6 TO ENFORCE TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF NEAL H. KONAMI; AND PROOF OF SERVICE IS GRANTED (SUBJECT TO RECEIPT AND REVIEW OF THE ORDER). JUDGE CHARLES F. HAINES, CLERK: N. WONG, NOT REPORTED, D501. | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY TO YEE DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO ATTACHMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT TO THEIR REQUEST FOR RETENTION OF COURT JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 664.6; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECL OF NEAL H. KONAMI; AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100046951) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KONAMI, KIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.