Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Smith, Matthew, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Reed, Michael James, against Does 1 To 50, Whole Foods Market, A Business Entity Form Unknown, Whole Foods Market California, Inc., represented by Rowley, Christian J., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Katherine Feinstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatherine Feinstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2011 |
CategoryWrongful Discharge |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions312 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time415 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Matthew Smith against Whole Foods Market, a business entity. The complaint alleges employment discrimination and harassment based on physical disability and medical condition, in violation of the Fair Emplo...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2012 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR DEC-03-2012 VACATED. DISMISSAL FILED ON 7/6/12. (206) | |
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC. | |
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMITH, MATTHEW | |
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM | |
March 29, 2012 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-03-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAR-29-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.