Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Beyerle, Sandra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cohn, Dona Eve, against Does 1 To 10, Ma, Xioa Hui, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2011 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions90 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time112 days |
This complaint is a dismissal with prejudice of a legal case filed by Sandra Beyerle against Xioa Hui Ma et al. The case number is CGC-11-509791 and the filing date is June 30, 2011. The document includes information about the attorney representing S...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 22, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-05-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 05, 2011 | Hearing |
PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | BEFORE HEARING, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS ORDERED OFF CALENDAR BY COURT. (610) | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR JUL-05-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 610 | |
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEYERLE, SANDRA AS TO DEFENDANT MA, XIOA HUI DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-05-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-31-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-21-2011 | |
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.