Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Alioto, Frank, Alioto, Kristen, Burgess, Adam, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Lopez, Ramon Rossi, against Burgess, Adam, Burgess, Lindsay, Does 1 To 100, Grupo Burges, Sa De Cv, Playa Fiesta Beachclub & Hotel, (total of 6) See All represented by Jameson, Bradley J., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions807 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1455 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2015 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-07-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 09, 2015 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-09-2015 - CASE SETTLED PER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 1/13/15. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON APR-07-2015 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56618048) | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56595308) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALIOTO, FRANK ALIOTO, KRISTEN | |
September 22, 2014 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RE MOTION BY DEFENDANT ADAM BURGESS AND LINDSAY BURGESS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES, STIPULATED BETWEEN THE PARTIES | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-22-2014 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON FEB-09-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER STIPULATED EX PARTE ORDER FILED 7/10/14. ALL FURTHER CONTINUANCES OF THE TRIAL DATE MUST BE SOUGHT BY NOTICED MOTION ONLY. (206) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.