Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aminco Inc., A California Corporation filed a(n) General Labor - Labor and Employment case represented by Heath, Michael, against Santos, Denner, Santos, Dennis, represented by Szydlik, Jason, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Harold E. Kahn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarold E. Kahn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions35 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Labor |
|
Case Cycle Time412 days |
ORDER TO POST AN UNDERTAKING
Date: August 01, 2008ORDER ON RESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: October 24, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO APPELLANT CABLE CAR PIZZA CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AMINCO INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO APPELLANT CABLE CAR PIZZA CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AMINCO INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER ON RESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT RESPONDENT SANTOS, DENNER ERRONEOUSLY NAMED DENNIS SANTOS RECOVER FROM APPELLANT CABLE CAR PIZZA CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AMINCO INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $10,021.95 PRINCIPAL, $1,622.88 ATTORNEY FEES, $347.67 INTEREST, TOTAL JUDGMENT $11,992.50, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
October 23, 2008 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES Set for hearing on Thursday, October 23, 2008, line 12. RESPONDENT DENNER SANTOS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES is granted. No opposition filed. =(302/HEK...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
October 23, 2008 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: RESPONDENT DENNER SANTOS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; COURT REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR #7077 | |
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR OCT-23-2008 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
October 14, 2008 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: DAVID BALLATI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.