Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hough, Randall D, United States Of America Chess Federation, Inc.,, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Kronenberger, Karl S., against Alexander, Gregory, Does 1-10, Inclusive, Polgar, Susan, represented by Gonzalez, Matthew Edward, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2008 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time141 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a case between the United States of America Chess Federation, Inc. and Susan Polgar, et al. The case number is CGC-08-476777 and the filing date is October 31, 2008. The document includes in...
ORDER AMENDED- GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE IMMEDIATE DISCOVERY
Date: November 07, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 25, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-26-2008 IS OFF CALENDAR, NOTICE OF REMOVAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY DEFENDANT POLGAR, SUSAN , AN INDIVIDUAL | |
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER AMENDED- GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE IMMEDIATE DISCOVERY | |
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING THE COURT'S PRIOR ORDER OF 10/31/08; NOTICE THEREOF; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF GREGORY ALEXANDER; PROPOSED ORDER. NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY GREGORY ALEXANDER. FILED BY DEFENDANT ALEXANDER, GREGORY , AN INDIVIDUAL | |
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE IMMEDIATE DISCOVERY (AMENDED ORDER FILE 11/7/08) | |
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA CHESS FEDERATION, INC., AN ILLINOIS NOT-FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION HOUGH, RANDALL D AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED OCT-24-2008, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT POLGAR, SUSAN , AN INDIVIDUAL | |
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EARLY DISCOVERY UNDER C. CIV. P. 2025.210 AND ORDER AUTHORIZING DISCLOSURE OF SUBSCRIBER INFORMATION UNDER 47 U.S.C. 551(C)(2)(B);, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA CHESS FEDERATION, INC., AN ILLINOIS NOT-FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION HOUGH, RANDALL D AN INDIVIDUAL | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA CHESS FEDERATION, INC., AN ILLINOIS NOT-FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION HOUGH, RANDALL D AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE POLGAR, SUSAN , AN INDIVIDUAL ALEXANDER, GREGORY , AN INDIVIDUAL | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA CHESS FEDERATION, INC., AN ILLINOIS NOT-FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION HOUGH, RANDALL D AN INDIVIDUAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.