Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nccs Inc.,Dba North Coast Collection Service, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mclaughlin, Lawrence Webster, against Does 1 To 10, Rivera, Angel, Rivera, Bessie L., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2008 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions480 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time865 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $313.73 INTEREST, $52.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF NCCS INC.,DBA NORTH COAST COLLECTION SERVICE | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | COST BILL, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $62.24 INTEREST, $52.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF NCCS INC.,DBA NORTH COAST COLLECTION SERVICE | |
August 26, 2009 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF NCCS INC.,DBA NORTH COAST COLLECTION SERVICE | |
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-26-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 | |
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NCCS INC.,DBA NORTH COAST COLLECTION SERVICE SERVED DEC-16-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT RIVERA, BESSIE L. | |
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF NCCS INC.,DBA NORTH COAST COLLECTION SERVICE RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT RIVERA, BESSIE L. RIVERA, ANGEL $2,140.00 PRINCIPAL, $535.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $533.53 INTEREST, $577.80 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,786.33, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $577.80 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT RIVERA, BESSIE L. RIVERA, ANGEL | |
June 24, 2009 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.