Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chipeur, Gerald, Gerald D. Chipeur Professional Corporation, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Silbert, Sarah, against Tim Twinam Carrying On Business As Peebs.Net, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2008 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions114 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time528 days |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-19-2008 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: September 09, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT TIM TWINAM CARRYING ON BUSINESS AS PEEBS | |
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT TIM TWINAM CARRYING ON BUSINESS AS PEEBS | |
September 19, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-19-2008 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHIPEUR, GERALD GERALD D. CHIPEUR PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION CARRYING ON BUSINESS AS CHIPEUR ADVOCATES | |
July 18, 2008 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JUL-10-2008 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 218 | |
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CHIPEUR, GERALD GERALD D. CHIPEUR PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION CARRYING ON BUSINESS AS CHIPEUR ADVOCATES RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TIM TWINAM CARRYING ON BUSINESS AS PEEBS.NET $50,165.32 PRINCIPAL, $4,008.92 INTEREST, $5,282.36 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $59,456.60, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2008 CONTINUED TO SEP-19-2008 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 10, 2008 | Hearing |
Default Prove-Up Hearing.
Judge: WILLIAM R. GARGANO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.