Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Kleinbaum, Leora, Kleinbaum, Oded, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Miller, Richard Steven, against Does 1 Through 25 Inclusive, Quivey M.D., Jeanne M., The Regents Of The State Of California Dba The, represented by Zimmerman, Marc Novak, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2006 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical/Dental |
|
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions130 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time372 days |
This complaint is a document related to a legal case. However, the text provided does not contain any specific details about the nature of the complaint, violation of statutes, or any dollar amounts. Therefore, it is not possible to summarize the tex...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 06, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2007 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-26-2007 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 22, 2007 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ENTIRE ACTION | |
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-22-2007 CONTINUED TO MAR-26-2007 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) JEANNE M. QUIVEY M.D. AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. JAN-22-2007 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE | |
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 13, 2006 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DBA THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA SAN FRANCISCO MEDICAL CENTER | |
December 11, 2006 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-11-2006 CONTINUED TO JAN-22-2007 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). DEC-11-2006 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.