Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

PARNELL VS OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORPORATION

Case Last Refreshed: 5 months

Case Overview

On January 5, 1995 A Civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

January 5, 1995

Last Refreshed

Feb 25, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Personal Injury - Asbestos

Parties

Plaintiff

Plaintiff

Leadattorney

See all parties

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 12/21/2007 09:02 AM D- 20
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 12/07/2007 09:18 AM D- 20
Docket Event Compliance Hearing 07/25/2007 09:05 AM D- 20
Docket Event Compliance Hearing Hearing Dropped from dept: 20 date: 06/13/2007 time: 09:05 AM
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party KENTILE FLOORS INC Filed
Docket Event Dismissal As to Defendant: KENTILE FLOORS INC Entered
Settlement Conference

judge: Robert Freedman

Docket Event Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Continue

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.