Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Youngblood, Stephan, Youngblood, Solo J, Youngblood, Shaney, Youngblood, Sean, Youngblood, Michael, (total of 100) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 1991 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Last RefreshedJune 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to WANIKA HARP Granted in Part
Date: August 02, 2004Petition Re: Withdrawal of Minor's Funds Filed for TIFFANY THOMAS
Date: 2001-08-15T00:00:00Order Granting Withdrawal of funds from Blocked Account Filed
Date: August 05, 2004Petition Re: Withdrawal of Minor's Funds Filed for D'ANDRE TURNER
Date: September 02, 2005Petition Re: Withdrawal of Minor's Funds Rejected
Date: 2003-12-17T00:00:00Petition Re: Withdrawal of Minor's Funds Filed for WANIKA HARP
Date: July 30, 2004Petition Re: Withdrawal of Minor's Funds Filed for WANIKA HARP
Date: 2003-12-15T00:00:00Probate Examiner's Check List for ex parte petn to withdraw funds Filed
Date: August 05, 2004Petition Re: Withdrawal of Minor's Funds Granted
Date: August 05, 2004Petition Re: Withdrawal of Minor's Funds Granted
Date: September 07, 2005Order Granting Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account (for D'Andre Turner) Filed
Date: September 07, 2005For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.