Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sargent, Brian, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hession, Irya, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2001 |
CategoryDv-100 Request For Order, Domestic Violence Prevention |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Dismissal Court Ordered Other: (specify) Filed | |
March 19, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed | |
April 12, 2001 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 201 date: 04/12/2001 time: 02:00 PM | |
March 19, 2001 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 04/12/2001 02:00 PM D-201 | |
March 19, 2001 | Docket Event | Application and Declaration for Order - Domestic Violence Prevention Filed | |
March 19, 2001 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Restraining Order (TEMPORARY)CLETS (FILED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.