Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bloomfield Merchant Services Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Barkin Steven J, Firm Mcelfish Law, against Chung Nack Kyung, Mega Card Solutions Inc., represented by Beck James K, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Debre Katz Weintraub presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebre Katz Weintraub Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2018JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2023 | Hearing | Ex-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Clerical Error on | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Bloomfield Merchant Services LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Mega Card Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Nack Kyung Chung (Defendant); County: Los Angeles | |
November 10, 2020 | Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES) | ||
November 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Bloomfield Merchant Services LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Bloomfield Merchant Services LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Mega Card Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Nack Kyung Chung (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 18906.16; Service Date: | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Bloomfield Merchant Services LLC (Plaintiff) | |
November 09, 2020 | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest | ||
November 09, 2020 | Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale | ||
November 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest Filed by Bloomfield Merchant Services LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
November 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale Filed by Bloomfield Merchant Services LLC (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.