Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bullock Naomi Taylor, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mark A. Borenstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Borenstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2017 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time78 days |
ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -
Date: November 13, 2017PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME
Date: November 13, 2017Other - - FW-001 Request to Waive Court Costs
Date: November 13, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2018 | DECREE CHANGING NAME | ||
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | DECREE CHANGING NAME | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 44 Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change |
|
January 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
January 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Decree Filed by Clerk |
|
January 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk |
|
December 08, 2017 | DECLARATION OF PUBLICATION | ||
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PUBLICATION | |
December 08, 2017 | Hearing |
Proof of Publication Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 13, 2017 | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.