Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Los Angeles City Of, Mama Wilcox Land Llc, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case against City Council Of The City Of Los Angeles, City Of Los Angeles, Planning Commision Of The City Of L.A., Does 1 To 50, Los Angeles Council Of The City Of, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Debre K. Weintraub presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebre K. Weintraub Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management179 days |
Filing DateJune 09, 2017 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc Southeast Dist. |
Case Cycle Time395 days |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 19, 2017NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2018 | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - | ||
July 18, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S Filed by Real Party in Interest |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
July 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department G Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Vacated) - |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department G Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Not Held-Continued) - |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department G Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Not Held-Continued) - |
|
January 08, 2018 | Hearing |
Answer Filed by Real Party in Interest |
|
January 02, 2018 | Hearing |
Answer Filed by Respondent |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department G Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.