Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deo Artie L., filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Taylor Arthur G., Taylor Arthur George, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Brenda Penny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrenda Penny Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2014 |
CategoryElder/Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions38 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time-301 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 2C, Hymowitz, Laura, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution Judge: Laura |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 2C, Hymowitz, Laura, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued Judge: Laura |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 29, 2017 | Hearing |
Request - Renew Restraining Order (Form 700) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 29, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice - Court Hearing Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
in 9, Brenda Penny, Presiding MOTION/APPL-TEMP RESTRAINING ORDER (TRO IN EFFECT) - Petition granted Judge: Brenda Penny |
|
September 22, 2014 | Hearing |
Proof of Service Filed by Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.