Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Settlement Funding Llc, Ford Frederick Jr., filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Shafai John Z. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Helen I. Bendix presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHelen I. Bendix Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2005 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time78 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Settlement Funding, LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Settlement Funding, LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 18 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
July 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 26, 2005 | Docket Event | OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ORDER | |
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION BY PETITIONER; ETC. | |
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Filed by Settlement Funding, LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
July 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 18 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
July 06, 2005 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION TO APPROVE TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.