Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Settlement Funding Llc, Harper Matthew P., filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Shafai John Z. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with John Shepard Wiley Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Shepard Wiley Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2004 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice Filed by Settlement Funding, LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
March 23, 2005 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Settlement Funding, LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
January 19, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice Filed by Settlement Funding, LLC (Plaintiff); Matthew P. Harper (Plaintiff) |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
January 04, 2005 | Hearing |
Order Filed by Settlement Funding, LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 Unknown Event Type |
|
December 28, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2004 | Hearing |
Declaration Filed by Settlement Funding, LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
December 28, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Settlement Funding, LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2004 | Hearing |
Declaration Filed by Settlement Funding, LLC (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.